Pink, Deborah (CPSO#: 90751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MDOT: 145 Front Street East
Room 304
Toronto ON  M5A 1E3
Phone: 416 591-4411
Fax: 416 640-2072
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Pink Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pink ( CPSO# 90751 )

Business Address:
MDOT
304 - 145 Front Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1E1
Phone Number: (647) 777-0130

Business Address:
2nd Floor
59 Adelaide Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Phone Number: (416) 591-4411

Business Address:
363 Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1A9
Phone Number: (416) 961-0113

Business Address:
87 Pembroke Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2N9
Phone Number: (416) 967-6069

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH PINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2014 to 04 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014