Pintea, Dana (CPSO#: 78124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Caroline Medical Group
Unit 15 to 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905) 632-8007
Fax: (905) 632-0375
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dana Pintea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pintea ( CPSO# 78124 )

Business Address:
3305 Harvester Road
Units 15 - 20
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 632-8007


Corporation Name: Chalklin Duncan Gallaccio Pintea Wallik Walsh Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chalklin ( CPSO# 55848 )
Dr. A. Gallaccio ( CPSO# 82590 )
Dr. D. Pintea ( CPSO# 78124 )
Dr. K. Walsh ( CPSO# 90905 )
Dr. G. Duncan ( CPSO# 66390 )
Dr. D. Wallik ( CPSO# 53982 )
Dr. R. Williams ( CPSO# 73981 )

Business Address:
Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 632-8007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA PINTEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTEA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004