Pinthus, Jehonathan Haim (CPSO#: 81148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Mar 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre & Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 64902
Fax: (905) 381-7071
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. H. Pinthus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pinthus ( CPSO# 81148 )

Business Address:
Henderson General Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 22 Apr 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jehonathan Haim Pinthus may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Surgery,  McMaster  University,  in which Dr. Pinthus
                        holds a geographical full-time teaching or research  appointment at
                        the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  will  automatically  expire when Dr. Pinthus no  longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.