Piquette, Dominique (CPSO#: 83081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room D-108
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 89618
Fax: (416) 480-4999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dominique Piquette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Piquette ( CPSO# 83081 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room D-108
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE PIQUETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIQUETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2007