Piteau, Shalea Joanne (CPSO#: 89132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
274 Dundas Street East
Suite 305
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 779-7575
Fax: (613) 779-8686
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Piteau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Piteau ( CPSO# 89132 )

Business Address:
305 - 274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 779-7575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHALEA JOANNE PITEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013