Podbielski, Dominik Waclaw (CPSO#: 90862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prism Eye Institute
Unit 1 Millway Plaza
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone: (905) 820-3937
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dominik W Podbielski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Podbielski ( CPSO# 90862 )

Business Address:
Prism Eye Institute
1 - 3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 820-3937

Business Address:
407 - 2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 5B4
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
207 - 71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
101 - 50 Burnhamthorpe Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (886) 656-2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMINIK WACLAW PODBIELSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PODBIELSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014