Podhradsky, Ludek (CPSO#: 83815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201 Ext. 3248
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

York Medical Chronic Pain Clinic
17215 Leslie St
Newmarket ON  L3Y8E4
Canada
Phone: 905-853-0404
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

York Medical Chronic Pain Clinic
17215 Leslie St
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Canada
Phone: 905-853-0404
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Podhradsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Podhradsky ( CPSO# 83815 )

Business Address:
18 Wyandotte Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5M6

Business Address:
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone Number: (905) 853-0404

Business Address:
Orillia Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUDEK PODHRADSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PODHRADSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2014