Poitevin, David Gordon (CPSO#: 25710)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Poitevin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Group Health Centre 240 McNabb St Sault Ste Marie, ON P6B 1Y5
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018