Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: May 1, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Findings of Guilt
George John Polemidiotis was found guilty of the following offences:
1. 3 counts of Sexual Assault contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: May 1, 2023
SENTENCE: December 19, 2023
• 3.5 years Imprisonment, to be served concurrently
• Victim Surcharge of $600
• 10 year prohibition on possession of weapons (s. 109 Criminal Code)
• DNA Order
• Order to comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registry Act) for 20 years
APPEALED
Dr. Polemidiotis has appealed the decision and is subject to a release order dated December 19, 2023 with the following conditions:
1. Sureties of Dr. Polemidiotis promise to pay $20,000 (without deposit).
2. Dr. Polemidiotis must surrender into custody at specified detention centre by 7:00 a.m. on the day of the hearing of the appeal or by 7:00 a.m. on April 26, 2024, whichever is earlier.
3. Dr. Polemidiotis must acknowledge that failure to surrender into custody in accordance with the terms of this release order will be deemed to constitute an abandonment of the appeal.
4. Dr. Polemidiotis must notify the Registrar of the Court of Appeal and the Crown Law Office – Criminal in writing within 24 hours of any change in his address.
5. Dr. Polemidiotis must notify the Registrar of the Court of Appeal and the Crown Law Office – Criminal in writing within 24 hours of any new charges.
6. Dr. Polemidiotis agrees that failure to comply with any condition in this release order may result in the revocation of the release order and incarceration.
7. Dr. Polemidiotis must pursue the appeal with all due diligence.
8. Dr. Polemidiotis agrees that any failure to pursue the appeal with due diligence may result in the dismissal of an application to extend the surrender date or to vary its form.
9. Dr. Polemidiotis must deliver to the Crown Law Office – Criminal forthwith a copy of this release order once it has been entered into.
10. Dr. Polemidiotis must reside with his surety at a specified address and not change his address without prior consent of the Court.
11. Dr. Polemidiotis must not contact or communicate with, directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, specified persons.
12. Dr. Polemidiotis must not be within 100 metres of any place where he knows specified persons to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place he knows them to be.
13. Dr. Polemidiotis must deposit any passports in his possession with Police within 24 hours of his release and must not reapply for a passport or any other travel permits or documents.
14. Dr. Polemidiotis must not possess any weapons as defined by the Criminal Code.
15. Dr. Polemidiotis must not apply for an authorization, licence or registration certificate for any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code.
16. Dr. Polemidiotis must not be involved, directly or indirectly, in the treatment or medical care of any patients, except as may be necessary in an emergency.
Source:
Other
Active Date: December 9, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Georgios Polemidiotis was charged with the following offences:
1. Three counts of sexual assault, between January 1, 2011 and August 31, 2021, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: December 9, 2022
Place of Charge: Newmarket
York Regional Police
Source:
Other
Active Date: December 7, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On December 7, 2022, the following Conditions of Release (Bail Conditions) were imposed on Georgios Polemidiotis:
1. Polemidiotis must notify specified police officer of any change to his address or employment.
2. Polemidiotis must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with specified person.
3. Polemidiotis must not go to any residence, place of employment, doctor’s office, or anywhere specified person might reasonably be.
4. Polemidiotis must not possess a firearm, crossbow, prohibited weapon, restricted weapon, prohibited device, ammunition, prohibited ammunition or explosive substance, and must surrender those that are in his possession and also any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling him to acquire or possess them.
5. Polemidiotis must not publish, broadcast, or transmit and not cause or permit publication, broadcasting, or transmission in any way, any information that could identify the victim(s) or witness(es) specified.
6. Polemidiotis must continue to abide by any current release conditions he is currently bound by.
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 9, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. George John Polemidiotis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 9, 2022: Dr. Polemidiotis is the subject of College investigations, including investigations arising from public complaints and following charges being laid against Dr. Polemidiotis under the Criminal Code of Canada. During the investigations and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal, Dr. Polemidiotis must not practice medicine in any jurisdiction until the matters are disposed of by a panel of the ICR Committee or of the Discipline Tribunal, or upon a minimum of forty-five (45) days’ notice to the College of Dr. Polemidiotis’ intent to return to the practice of medicine, upon which the College may take interim action.