Pop, Cristina Ana (CPSO#: 82708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sumac Creek Clinic
73 Regent Park BLVD.
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone: (416) 864-3022
Fax: (416) 864-6051
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cristina Ana Pop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pop ( CPSO# 82708 )

Business Address:
73 Regent Park Boulevard
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5A 4P5
Phone Number: (416) 864-3022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRISTINA ANA POP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007