Pope, Jennifer Rachel (CPSO#: 95068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Department of Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gallupe Pope Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pope ( CPSO# 95068 )
Dr. P. Gallupe ( CPSO# 95526 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Department of Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9300

Business Address:
125 Lakeview Avenue
Kingston ON  L7M 3T6
Phone Number: (613) 384-4664

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER RACHEL POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014