Poppen, Jacquline (CPSO#: 83080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:Calicut University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greensborough Family Medical Centre
Unit 10
10 Greensborough Village Circle
Markham ON  L6E 1M4
Phone: (905) 201-1143
Fax: (905) 209-1172
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GFMC MEDICAL CENTRE
101-9500 MARKHAM ROAD
MARKHAM
Markham ON  L6E 0N7
Canada
Phone: (905) 201-1155
Fax: (905) 201-1129
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacquline Poppen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Poppen ( CPSO# 83080 )

Business Address:
10 - 10 Greensborough Village Circle
Markham ON  L6E 1M4
Phone Number: (905) 201-1143

Business Address:
GFMC Walk-in Clinic & Family Practice
Suite 101
9500 Markham Road
Markham ON  L6E 0N7
Phone Number: (905) 201-1155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQULINE POPPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPPEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007