Porte, Alexis N'gai (CPSO#: 92848)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Porte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Westview Medical, Suite 101, 550 Carmi Avenue, Penticton, BC V2A 3G6
Date Received: 16 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Newfoundland and Labrador
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2011 to 11 Apr 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016