Potvin, Kylea Raijann (CPSO#: 77638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Medical Oncology A3917
London Regional Cancer Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010 Station B
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: (519) 685-8624
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.R. Potvin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Warsh ( CPSO# 83535 )
Dr. K. Potvin ( CPSO# 77638 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology Room A3-917
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8640

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLEA RAIJANN POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2005