Potvin, William Reginald (CPSO#: 69339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
72 Bridge Street
Carleton Place ON  K7C 2V3
Phone: (613) 253-8192
Fax: (613) 253-2566
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Potvin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Potvin ( CPSO# 69339 )

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1T4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
72 Bridge Street
Carleton Place ON  K7C 2V3
Phone Number: (613) 253-8192

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 May 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM REGINALD POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Apr 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2002