Power, Laura Josephine (CPSO#: 93279)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Arthur Clinic
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Power Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Power ( CPSO# 93279 )

Business Address:
Port Arthur Clinic
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA JOSEPHINE POWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 11 Aug 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015