Prabhakar, Manu (CPSO#: 72214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P A C E Clinic
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (855) 215-4815
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: 905-895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie, Ontario
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manu Prabhakar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Prabhakar ( CPSO# 72214 )

Business Address:
602 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Business Address:
Southlake Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANU PRABHAKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRABHAKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2002