Prasad, Asuri Narayan (CPSO#: 79531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Tamil, Telugu

Education:University of Delhi, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Section of Clinical Neurosciences,
B-174, C H W O / L H S C
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58332
Fax: (519) 685-8350
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. N. Prasad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Prasad ( CPSO# 79531 )

Business Address:
Section of Clinical Neurosciences
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 2V5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8677


Corporation Name: Garima Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Prasad ( CPSO# 79531 )
Dr. G. Shukla ( CPSO# 115237)

Business Address:
Section of Clinical Neurosciences
B-174, CHWO/LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Queen's University
Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2967

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
HDH Site
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 13 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASURI NARAYAN PRASAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRASAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2003