Pratt, Rebecca Sunny (CPSO#: 90853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: Norrad, Rebecca Sunny (used until: 07 Dec 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aviva Medical Specialists Clinic
Suite 201
180 Vine St. S
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: (905) 662-3303
Fax: (905) 662-3304
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pratt ( CPSO# 90853 )

Business Address:
Aviva Medical Specialists Clinic
2nd Floor
35 upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3303

Business Address:
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 662-3303

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA SUNNY PRATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRATT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013