Prevost, Michel Ronald (CPSO#: 68293)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Feb 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.R. Prevost Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Feb 2015

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Feb 2015
Summary:

 On February 2, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Prevost committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession 
 with respect to 28 patients. The Committee also found that Dr. Prevost is incompetent in his 
practice of obstetrics and gynecology. Dr. Prevost admitted the allegations. 
  
 In response to concerns brought to the attention of the College, the College commenced an 
 investigation into Dr. Prevost’s practice. 
 
In the course of the College’s investigation, Dr. Prevost voluntarily entered into an Undertaking 
with the College signed January 23, 2013, to cease to prescribe Methotrexate and/or Misoprostol 
for the purpose of terminating pregnancies. Upon referral of the allegations to the Discipline 
Committee, Dr. Prevost entered into an Undertaking with the College signed November 20, 2013 
in lieu of the imposition of an Order under s. 37 of the Health Professions Procedural Code to 
cease to practice obstetrics and gynecology. 
 
A Medical Inspector retained by the College found that in his care and treatment of 28 patients, 
 Dr. Prevost did not meet standard of practice of the profession and lacked knowledge, skill or 
 judgment. The Medical Inspector identified a number of specific concerns pertaining to Dr. 
 Prevost’s obstetrics and gynecology practice. 
  
 With respect to cases pertaining to medical terminations, Dr. Prevost’s care fell below the 
 standard of practice of the profession in failing to comply with The Society of Obstetricians and 
 Gynecologists of Canada Induced Abortion Guidelines (SOGC Guidelines). He displayed a lack 
of judgment and patients were exposed to harm or injury in his failure to properly screen patients 
for medical terminations, in his failure to calculate doses of Methotrexate on the basis of his 
patients’ respective body surface areas, and in his failure to follow up with patients including 
when he was aware that patients had on-going gestations after the administration of 
Methotrexate. In the cases of on-going gestations, the patients’ fetuses were exposed to risk of 
harm in that they were exposed to Methotrexate and Misoprostol. There were documented fetal 
abnormalities in two pregnancies that went to term. Whether or not the abnormalities were 
caused by the medications administered for the purpose of terminating the pregnancies was not 
the subject of the College’s investigation because it was not necessary for proof of the 
allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing.   
 
Additionally, the Medical Inspector found Dr. Prevost breached the standard of practice of the 
profession and lacked judgment in the following areas: 
 
   a) obtaining weights and urine dips in his pre-natal patients; 
   b) charting pre-operatively and post-operatively; 
   c) obtaining or documenting informed consent; 
   d) obtaining appropriate pre-operative medical and/or anesthetic consults when indicated; 
   e) following up appropriately and in a timely manner in his gynecological and obstetrical 
      practice; and 
   f) communicating with physician and nursing colleagues about his availability and/or lack 
      of availability and/or when he was or was not taking responsibility for his patients who 
      presented at or were admitted to hospital. 
 
On February 2, 2015, Dr. Prevost signed an undertaking to resign from the College and not to 
apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practice medicine in Ontario. In addition, Dr. 
Prevost has undertaken never to practice obstetrics or gynecology in any jurisdiction. 
 
Having regard to this Undertaking, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
   •  Dr. Prevost attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   •  Dr. Prevost pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within 60 days of the date of 
      this Order.  
   •  The results of this proceeding be included in the register. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): February 2, 2015

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: February 2, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)
of
DR. MICHEL RONALD PREVOST
(“Dr. Prevost”)
to
THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)


A. PREAMBLE
(1) I, Dr. Prevost, certificate of registration number 68293, am a member of the College.

(2) I, Dr. Prevost, acknowledge and agree that the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
referred allegations that I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and was
incompetent in my obstetrics and gynecology practice to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of
Hearing dated October 16, 2013 (the “Notice of Hearing”). My practice also includes hair transplants
and non-surgical medical aesthetics; these aspects of my practice were not the subject of the College’s
investigation or the allegations in the Notice of Hearing.

(3) I, Dr. Prevost, admit the facts set out in the Agreed Statement of Facts and therefore the
allegations in the Notice of Hearing.

B. UNDERTAKING
(4) I, Dr. Prevost, hereby resign from the College effective February 2, 2015 (the “Effective Date”).

(5) I, Dr. Prevost, undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practice
medicine in Ontario after the Effective Date.

(6) I, Dr. Prevost, undertake that within 2 days of the Effective Date of this Undertaking, I shall
forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my
billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the Effective Date of this Undertaking, and to
provide proof of same to the College within 15 days.

(7) I, Dr. Prevost, confirm that I have not practiced obstetrics or gynecology in Ontario since
February, 2014.

(8) I, Dr. Prevost, undertake never to practice obstetrics or gynecology in any jurisdiction after the
Effective Date.


(9) I, Dr. Prevost, agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I am in breach of
this Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I have either applied, re-applied or
attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration, or
equivalent, to practice medicine in Ontario after the Effective Date, or that I have practiced obstetrics
or gynecology in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall, in its sole discretion, have
the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Prevost, undertake to the College to abide by the terms of the College’s Policy on Practice
Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of
Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix
A.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(11) I, Dr. Prevost, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs,
charges, expenses, etc., if any, arising from the implementation of any of the terms of this
Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Prevost, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and
conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

D. CONSENT
(13) I, Dr. Prevost, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP
and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

(14) I, Dr. Prevost, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide any person who requires
information for the purposes of ensuring my compliance with this Undertaking with any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15) I, Dr. Prevost, consent to this Undertaking being entered on the public register as information that
is available to the public.