Primiani, Nadia Sarah (CPSO#: 94379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Primiani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Primiani ( CPSO# 94379 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA SARAH PRIMIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIMIANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2014