Pun, Teresa Wai Chong (CPSO#: 87998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Health Centre
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Phone: (416) 489-2106
Fax: (416) 489-2981
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Uptown Health
9325 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V4
Canada
Phone: (905) 508-8876
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David J. Holt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pun ( CPSO# 87998 )
Dr. D. Holt ( CPSO# 90307 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 489-2106

Business Address:
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone Number: (905) 508-8876

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERESA WAI CHONG PUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2008 to 10 Feb 2008
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2009 to 01 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 03 Aug 2009 to 30 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2012 to 08 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012