Punthakee, Xerxes Dinshaw (CPSO#: 81066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
491 Eglington Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 787-5511
Fax: (416) 787-1592
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

OTOHNS Department
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 596-4200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Champagne Centre
Unit B17
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 645-1978
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Xerxes Punthakee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Punthakee ( CPSO# 81066 )

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Business Address:
Suite 300
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 787-5511

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 401
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XERXES DINSHAW PUNTHAKEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNTHAKEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010