Puvendran, Samuel Nandakumar (CPSO#: 85505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Geriatrics Assessment Program
5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 53013
Fax: (905) 358-4972
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site
Internal Medicine
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 45501
Fax: (905) 704-4435
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
Department of Hospital Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 33016
Fax: (905) 788-0046
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL NANDAKUMAR PUVENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUVENDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2006 to 10 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 17 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2008