Qin, Jing (CPSO#: 88841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 304
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 673-9373
Fax: 416-673-9374
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jing Qin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Qin ( CPSO# 88841 )

Business Address:
520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 304
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 673-9373

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JING QIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013