Quan, Kimmen (CPSO#: 87156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 379-4647
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 387-9495
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kimmen Quan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Quan ( CPSO# 87156 )

Business Address:
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMMEN QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2015