Qureshi, Adnan (CPSO#: 95637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
Department of General Surgery
10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

835 King St. West
Kitchner, ON
N2G 1G3
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: 519-749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: 519-744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adnan Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Qureshi ( CPSO# 95637 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (416) 428-0790

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADNAN QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2018