Yeung, Robert (CPSO#: 83681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
AG31c-2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 89324
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room AG31c
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006