Rackal, Julia Miranda (CPSO#: 81395)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-7426
Fax: (416) 867-7498
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rackal ( CPSO# 81395 )
Dr. W. Johnson ( CPSO# 81231 )

Business Address:
520 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 427-2255

Business Address:
178 John Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2A4
Phone Number: (905) 455-4414

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Suite 204
1370 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Phone Number: (905) 949-4488

Business Address:
105 - 10 Cotrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 497-2255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA MIRANDA RACKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACKAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006