Racz, Heather Nicole (CPSO#: 79175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 954-6021
Fax: (519) 954-6251
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Racz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Racz ( CPSO# 79175 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 954-6021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 08 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER NICOLE RACZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007