Radke, Steven Phillip (CPSO#: 77476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
510 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P5
Phone: (613) 433-9152
Fax: (613) 433-9154
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Radke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Radke ( CPSO# 77476 )

Business Address:
510 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P5
Phone Number: (613) 433-9152

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN PHILLIP RADKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004