Rafilovich, Seda (CPSO#: 92002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: Tamrazova, Seda Sergueevna (used until: 29 Aug 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valey and Scarborough Hospita
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (426)284-8131 Ext. 5100
Fax: (416)281-7082
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

SJCG, 35 N Algoma S.
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Canada
Phone: (807)345-2352
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

980 Oliver Rd
TBRHSC
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6030
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seda Rafilovich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rafilovich ( CPSO# 92002 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 26 Jan 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEDA RAFILOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAFILOVICH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011