Rahimi Darabad, Parisa (CPSO#: 78125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unicare Clinic
Suite 401
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 548-9701
Fax: (416) 548-9702
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1835 Yonge Street
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-792-9436
Fax: 416-792-9438
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rahimi Darabad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rahimi Darabad ( CPSO# 78125 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4427

Business Address:
Unicare Clinic
Suite 401
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 548-9701

Business Address:
303 - 1835 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 792-9436

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 08 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARISA RAHIMI DARABAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHIMI DARABAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006