Rahman, Mohammed Ataur (CPSO#: 75998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Road Medical Centre
7160 Markham Road
Markham ON  L3S 3J8
Phone: (905) 472-7400
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.A. Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rahman ( CPSO# 75998 )

Business Address:
Markham Road Medical Centre
7160 Markham Road
Markham ON  L3S 3J8
Phone Number: (905) 472-7400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ATAUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 May 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Aug 2007
Summary:

 On August 23, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Rahman committed professional misconduct in 
 that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to 
 all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.   The Committee ordered the following: 

1.	The Discipline Committee directs the 
 Registrar to suspend Dr. Rahman(s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, to 
 commence on June 1, 2008, which suspension shall be suspended in its entirety if prior to June 1, 
 2008, Dr. Rahman successfully completes, at his own expense, the Collegeapproved course in Medical 
 Ethics and Informed Consent, and provides proof thereof to the College.   

2.   	The Discipline 
 Committee directs Dr. Rahman to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3.  	The Discipline 
 Committee Orders Dr. Rahman to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00 within 60 days 
 of the date of this Order. 

4.      	The Discipline Committee directs the results of this 
 proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 23, 2007