Rajabalee, Mahmud Ahmad (CPSO#: 85170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
188 St Clair Street
Chatham ON  N7L 3J6
Phone: (519) 397-4753
Fax: (519) 397-4518
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahmud Rajabalee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rajabalee ( CPSO# 85170 )

Business Address:
188 St. Clair Street
Chatham ON  N7L 3J6
Phone Number: (519) 397-4753

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Mauritius

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHMUD AHMAD RAJABALEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJABALEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2010