Rambaldini, Gloria Mirvana (CPSO#: 75080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Endocrinology Centres Ltd
Suite 5
1600 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4K 3B9
Phone: (905) 763-8660
Fax: (905) 763-0708
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Rambaldini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rambaldini ( CPSO# 75080 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
1600 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4K 4M2

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLORIA MIRVANA RAMBALDINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMBALDINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004