Rammohan, Gnanaprabha Mary (CPSO#: 78084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Madras, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
140 Niagara Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4L4
Phone: (905) 688-4538
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.M. Rammohan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rammohan ( CPSO# 78084 )

Business Address:
102 - 140 Niagara Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4L4
Phone Number: (905) 688-4538

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GNANAPRABHA MARY RAMMOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMMOHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004