Rampton, Vincent Joel (CPSO#: 63979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victorian Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (905) 728-9802 Ext. 4121
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huronia Urgent Care Center
480 Huronia Road
Suite 204
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 716-7725
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

OATC
Barrie ON  L4M 3G7
Canada
Phone: 705-730-0286
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Barrie Chronic Pain Center
Barrie ON  L4N8X3
Canada
Phone: 705-792-7890
Fax: 705-719-4848
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Joel Rampton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Rampton ( CPSO# 63979 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
Suite 101
500 Hurona Road
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Phone Number: (705) 792-7890

Business Address:
49 High Street
Suite 206
Barrie ON  L4N 5J4
Phone Number: (705) 730-0286

Business Address:
480 Huronia Road
Unit 102
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-0933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT JOEL RAMPTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMPTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1992