Ramraj, Omawattie (CPSO#: 89785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Guyana, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ONE HEALTH CARE
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: (905) 239-7663
Fax: (905) 239-4664
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

255 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1E 3E6
Canada
Phone: 4162841020
Fax: 416 284 1271
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omawattie Ramraj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ramraj ( CPSO# 89785 )

Business Address:
One Health Care
Suite 201
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone Number: (905) 239-7663

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAWATTIE RAMRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMRAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2010