Rana, Amit (CPSO#: 84338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Plains Family Practice
Unit #20
100 Plains Road West
Burlington ON  L7T 0A5
Phone: (905) 333-0105
Fax: 888-763-5181
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

245 Pelham Rd #202
St. Catharines, ON
L2S 1X8
St Catharines ON  L2S1X8
Canada
Phone: 905-988-1933
Fax: 905-988-5918
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amit Rana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rana ( CPSO# 84338 )

Business Address:
20 - 18 Plains Road West
Burlington ON  L7T 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 218-6444

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIT RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008