Rancourt, Marie-France (CPSO#: 91000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 746-6745
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie-France Rancourt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rancourt ( CPSO# 91000 )

Business Address:
595 Montreal Road
Suite 202
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 746-6745

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-FRANCE RANCOURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANCOURT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015