Raut-Deshpande, Pooja (CPSO#: 93649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Names: Deshpande, Pooja (used until: 13 May 2014 )     Raut, Pooja (used until: 25 Apr 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3737
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

169 Main Street East
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Canada
Phone: 905-945-2253
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

1200 Fourth Avenue
Department of Internal Medicine
St. Catharines Site
Niagara Health System
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Raut-Deshpande Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Raut-Deshpande ( CPSO# 93649 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
Niagara Health System
Department of Internal Medicine
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
A Wing
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (289) 264-6885

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. POOJA RAUT-DESHPANDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAUT-DESHPANDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014