Ravi, Bheeshma (CPSO#: 89218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 315
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone: (416) 967-8730
Fax: (416) 967-8731
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Ravi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ravi ( CPSO# 89218 )

Business Address:
Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
Suite 315
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8730

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BHEESHMA RAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016