Ravid-Einy, Anat (CPSO#: 75747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone: (519) 258-4433
Fax: (519) 258-8793
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anat Ravid-Einy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ravid-Einy ( CPSO# 75747 )

Business Address:
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Suite 101
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 258-4433

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANAT RAVID-EINY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVID-EINY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2008