Raynor, Christopher Fitzgerald (CPSO#: 74705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Jamaican Creole

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Human 2.0
2202 Thurston Dr
Ottawa ON  K1G 6E1
Phone: (613) 730-5483
Fax: (613) 730-5484
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

N203-801 King Edward Ave
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: (613) 564-3950 Ext. 4
Fax: (613) 564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall, ON
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Fax: (613) 482-1406
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Raynor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Raynor ( CPSO# 74705 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Sports
Medicine & Physiotherapy Centre
Suite N203
801 King Edward Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4246

Business Address:
2202 Thurston Drive
Ottawa ON  K1G 6E1
Phone Number: (613) 730-5483

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 29 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER FITZGERALD RAYNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYNOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007