Ready, William Kirkby (CPSO#: 96945)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Kirk Ready Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre, 50 College Drive, North Bay, ON P1B 0A4
Date Received: 09 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016