Rebello, Ryan Paul (CPSO#: 71123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology T0112
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34984
Fax: (905) 308-7207
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Rebello Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Ultrasound Diagnostic Services
302 - 200 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone Number: (905) 522-2220

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Radiology - T0112
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6009

Business Address:
Charlton X-Ray and Ultrasound
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
Ancaster X-Ray and Ultrasound
323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Centre Ambulatory
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G1 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN PAUL REBELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REBELLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002