Reddy, Natalie Yee Mun (CPSO#: 84245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: Foong, Natalie Yee Mun (used until: 27 Jul 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 633-9292
Fax: (519) 633-9413
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reddy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Reddy ( CPSO# 84302 )
Dr. N. Reddy ( CPSO# 84245 )

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 639-9171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE YEE MUN REDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011