Reed, Cari Leanne (CPSO#: 72350)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Walsh, Carol Leanne (used until: 26 Jul 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beamsville Medical Centre
P O Box 430
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Fax: (905) 563-0933
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cari Reed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Reed ( CPSO# 72350 )

Business Address:
Beamsville Medical Centre
PO Box 430
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone Number: (905) 563-5315

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARI LEANNE REED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000