Refaie Shirpak, Khosro (CPSO#: 92976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105-323 Wilson St. E.
Ancaster ON  L9G 4A8
Phone: 905-648-1112
Fax: 905-648-2033
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Refaie Shirpak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Refaie Shirpak ( CPSO# 92976 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 648-1112

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHOSRO REFAIE SHIRPAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REFAIE SHIRPAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2014